Loper v. Boone et al
Plaintiff: Malik Derrick Loper
Defendant: T. Walter, John Doe, Z.W. Boone, Z. Miller and C. Fisher
Case Number: 3:2020cv01482
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DB
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 Letter re Supporting Briefs and Law Library access filed by Malik Derrick Loper.. (bg)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED;Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/1/20. cc: Warden/Superintendent to arrange and begin PLRA civil filing fee payments;(ep)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Z.W. Boone, C. Fisher, Z. Miller, T. Walter with copy of Complaint and Waiver Order; Waiver of Service due by 11/2/2020. copy of Complaint and Waiver Order to PA State Atty General; (ep)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/1/20. (bs)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 U.S. MARSHAL - Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (bg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Malik Derrick Loper.(bg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Federal & Local Rules, #4 398 Form, #5 399 Form) (lp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT filed by Affiant Malik Derrick Loper in Support of his Motion for Counsel. (lp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Malik Derrick Loper.(lp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Malik Derrick Loper. (lp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, including certification, by Malik Derrick Loper.(lp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Malik Derrick Loper.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loper v. Boone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Derrick Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z.W. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?