REB Steel Equipment Corp. v. Pieszala
Plaintiff: REB Steel Equipment Corp.
Counter Plaintiff: Laureen Pieszala
Case Number: 3:2020cv01483
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by REB Steel Equipment Corp..(Schreiber, Phillip)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against REB Steel Equipment Corp. by Laureen Pieszala.(Walsh, Kevin)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to September 18, 2020. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 9/16/2020 (ve)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Martin Walsh, Jr on behalf of Laureen Pieszala (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Walsh, Kevin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Laureen Pieszala. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Walsh, Kevin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by REB Steel Equipment Corp.. Laureen Pieszala served on 8/23/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Tellado, Christina)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Sara A. Begley, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 8/24/2020. (ve)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Phillip M. Schreiber, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 8/24/2020. (ve)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Dana E. Feinstein, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 8/24/2020. (ve)
August 24, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners Sara Begley, Dana Feinstein, Phillip Schreiber and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Phillip Schreiber on behalf of REB Steel Equipment Corp. Attorney Phillip M. Schreiber is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5220345.. (Schreiber, Phillip)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Dana E. Feinstein on behalf of REB Steel Equipment Corp. Attorney Dana Feinstein is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5220305.. (Feinstein, Dana)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Sara A. Begley on behalf of REB Steel Equipment Corp. Attorney Sara Begley is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number BPAMDC-5218430.. (Begley, Sara)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE REPORT by REB Steel Equipment Corp. by REB Steel Equipment Corp..(Tellado, Christina)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina T Tellado on behalf of REB Steel Equipment Corp. (Tellado, Christina)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Laureen Pieszala and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laureen Pieszala ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5213973), filed by REB Steel Equipment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REB Steel Equipment Corp. v. Pieszala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REB Steel Equipment Corp.
Represented By: Sara A. Begley
Represented By: Christina T Tellado
Represented By: Dana E. Feinstein
Represented By: Phillip Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Laureen Pieszala
Represented By: Kevin Martin Walsh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?