Maitland v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Keble Garry Maitland
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Clair Doll, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, William Barr, Simona Flores-Lund and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv01559
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to William Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 11/19/2020 (ms)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Keble Garry Maitland YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 11/19/2020 (ms)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by William Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf by William Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Served on Warden, U.S. Atty Scranton, U.S. Atty General Wash DC (ep)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/19/2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/5/20. (ms)
September 10, 2020 Receipt of payment from KEBLE MAITLAND in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 9/9/2020. Receipt number 333072908 processed by gangeli. (jjs)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lg) Modified on 9/1/2020 (jw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner (Maitland) to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(lg) Modified on 9/1/2020 (jw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for expedition of the case due to Covid-19 Pandemic by Keble Garry Maitland. (lg) Modified on 9/1/2020 (jw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Humanitarian Release from Covid-19, lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, Keble Garry Maitland, pro se.(lg) Modified on 9/1/2020 (jw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maitland v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keble Garry Maitland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?