Eaton v. Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ruth Eaton
Defendant: Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc. doing business as Commonwealth Health Systems doing business as Wilkes-Barre General Hospital, LLC doing business as Wilkes-Barre General Hospital
Case Number: 3:2020cv01596
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 11:15 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/9/20. (dmn)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction with certificate of service and certification of word count filed by Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc..(Steinberg, Sidney)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - ORDERED that the request (Doc. #9 ) is GRANTED and defendant shall file its reply no later than Monday, October 5, 2020. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/28/2020. (ktt)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Daniel Thornton requesting extension to file Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Thornton, Daniel)
September 13, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBIT - Unpublished Opinion by Ruth Eaton re #7 Brief in Opposition. (Pollick, Cynthia)
September 13, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by Ruth Eaton.(Pollick, Cynthia)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT Defendant, Wilkes-Barre Hospital Company, LLC's re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Agreement between Wilkes-Barre Hospital and WVNA/PASNAP, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Carpenter v, Wawa)(Steinberg, Sidney)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction by Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence)(Steinberg, Sidney)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures - Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/3/2020. (ktt)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc.. (Steinberg, Sidney)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B)(ao)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc. from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2020-06725. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APAMDC-5237252), filed by Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton v. Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Eaton
Represented By: Cynthia L. Pollick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Health Systems, Inc. doing business as Commonwealth Health Systems doing business as Wilkes-Barre General Hospital, LLC doing business as Wilkes-Barre General Hospital
Represented By: Sidney R. Steinberg
Represented By: Daniel F. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?