Gatto v. Lackawanna County et al
Plaintiff: Katie Gatto
Defendant: Officers John/Jane Doe I-IV, Officer Eric Jordan, Dunmore Borough, Lackawanna County District Attorney's Office, City of Scranton, Detective Harold Zech, Detective Corey Condrad, Officer Gerry Tallo, Detective Joseph Jordan, Detective John Munley, Mark Powell and Lackawanna County
Case Number: 3:2020cv01684
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by City of Scranton, Eric Jordan, Gerry Tallo Certificate of Non Concurrence (Lamb, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by City of Scranton, Eric Jordan, Gerry Tallo.(Lamb, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Scranton, Eric Jordan, Gerry Tallo.(Lamb, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Joseph Kozlowski on behalf of Corey Condrad, Dunmore Borough. (Kozlowski, Mark)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 01:30 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/9/20. (dmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2020: #1 Calendar) (spm).
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Katie Gatto. Lackawanna County waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Cimini, Vincent)
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Doherty, Jr on behalf of Lackawanna County (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Doherty, James)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Doherty, Jr on behalf of Lackawanna County (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Doherty, James)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Dunmore Borough. Dunmore Borough waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Boland, Patrick)
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dunmore Borough. (Boland, Patrick)
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Boland, III on behalf of Dunmore Borough (Boland, Patrick)
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Katie Gatto. Gerry Tallo waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Cimini, Vincent)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Katie Gatto. Eric Jordan waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Cimini, Vincent)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Katie Gatto. City of Scranton waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Cimini, Vincent)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Katie Gatto. Joseph Jordan waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020; Lackawanna County District Attorney's Office waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020; John Munley waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020; Mark Powell waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020; Harold Zech waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Cimini, Vincent)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Lamb on behalf of City of Scranton, Eric Jordan, Gerry Tallo (Lamb, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Santarone, Jr on behalf of City of Scranton, Eric Jordan, Gerry Tallo (Santarone, Joseph)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Joseph Kozlowski on behalf of Corey Condrad. (Kozlowski, Mark)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joseph Jordan, Lackawanna County District Attorney's Office, John Munley, Mark Powell, Harold Zech. (Hinton, J.)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Corey Condrad. (Boland, Patrick)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Boland, III on behalf of Corey Condrad (Boland, Patrick)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Corey Condrad. Corey Condrad waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Boland, Patrick)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Timothy Hinton on behalf of Joseph Jordan, Lackawanna County District Attorney's Office, John Munley, Mark Powell, Harold Zech (Hinton, J.)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/17/20. (ma)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5255383), filed by Katie Gatto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gatto v. Lackawanna County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officers John/Jane Doe I-IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eric Jordan
Represented By: John L. Lamb
Represented By: Joseph J. Santarone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunmore Borough
Represented By: Patrick J. Boland, III
Represented By: Mark Joseph Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lackawanna County District Attorney's Office
Represented By: J. Timothy Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Scranton
Represented By: John L. Lamb
Represented By: Joseph J. Santarone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Harold Zech
Represented By: J. Timothy Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Corey Condrad
Represented By: Patrick J. Boland, III
Represented By: Mark Joseph Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gerry Tallo
Represented By: John L. Lamb
Represented By: Joseph J. Santarone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Joseph Jordan
Represented By: J. Timothy Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective John Munley
Represented By: J. Timothy Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Powell
Represented By: J. Timothy Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lackawanna County
Represented By: James A. Doherty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Gatto
Represented By: Vincent S. Cimini
Represented By: Robert J Levant
Represented By: Sal Cognetti, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?