Fala et al v. Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Plaintiff: Vincent W. Fala and Judith A. Fala
Defendant: Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC doing business as CVS Health Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv01801
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER,Presently before the court is a letter from plaintiffs counsel explaining the filing of the related case 3:CV-20-1801. Since these matters are identical except for the addition of the assertion of a strict liability claim, the cases will be consolidated. The clerk shall docket the complaint from civil action 3:20-1801 as an amended complaint in 3:19-1132. The clerk shall close civil action 3:20-1801 and all filings will docketed to 3:19-1132. Cases associated., ORDER TERMINATING CASESigned by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/23/20. (bs)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Vincent W. Fala, Judith A. Fala. Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Hockenberry, James)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/7/20. (bs)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5280827), filed by Vincent W. Fala, Judith A. Fala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)
October 2, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: The Honorable Judge Mannion assigned to this case. (pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fala et al v. Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC doing business as CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent W. Fala
Represented By: James E. Hockenberry
Represented By: H. Leon Aussprung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A. Fala
Represented By: James E. Hockenberry
Represented By: H. Leon Aussprung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?