Dayton v. The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut et al
Plaintiff: Alan Dayton
Defendant: The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Travelers Companies, Inc. and Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford
Case Number: 3:2020cv01833
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT filed by Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Travelers Companies, Inc..(Foland, Brooks)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 7/1/2021. Defendant Expert Report is due by 8/1/2021.Supplemental due by 9/15/2021. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 10/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2021. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/24/20. (bs)
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Remand Kevin P. Foley filed by Alan Dayton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G)(Foley, Kevin)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Travelers Companies, Inc..(Foland, Brooks)
November 12, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: The CMC will be held at 4:00 p.m. (not 10:30). (bs)
November 11, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alan Dayton.(Foley, Kevin)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Kevin P. Foley 11-12-2020 Hearing Call-In Information. (Foley, Kevin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Amended by Alan Dayton. (Foley, Kevin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Alan Dayton. (Foley, Kevin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Alan Dayton.(Foley, Kevin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Alan Dayton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(Foley, Kevin)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Ehrhart on behalf of Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Travelers Companies, Inc. (Ehrhart, Nicole)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Travelers Companies, Inc..(Foland, Brooks)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.This conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff, who is responsible for placing the conference call, shall provide the court via e-filing a call-in number in which the court may call to connect to the conference call. It is counsels obligation to supply the conference contact information to opposing counsel and the court. This can be placed on the docket under seal or supplied independently to opposing counsel and the court, in order to protect the privacy and security of the teleconference.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/15/20. (bs)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/15/20. (bs)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Travelers Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foland, Brooks)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Travelers Companies, Inc.. (Foland, Brooks)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Travelers Companies, Inc., Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford from Court of Common Pleas of Lackawanna County, case number 2020-CV-2711. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APAMDC-5287061), filed by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Travelers Companies, Inc., Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Exhibit(s) E, #8 Exhibit(s) F)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dayton v. The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Represented By: Nicole M. Ehrhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Represented By: Nicole M. Ehrhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Represented By: Nicole M. Ehrhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Dayton
Represented By: Kevin P. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?