WEBSTER v. INTERMATIC, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PAUL AND MARIE WEBSTER
Defendant: John Doe #14 and Intermatic, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01903
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04586 containing electronic documents. (ao)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' STIPULATION AND ORDER OF THE PARTIES TO TRANSFER VENUE AND WITHDRAW REMAINING MOTIONS TO DISMISS IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED IN PART. THIS MATTER IS TRANSFERRED TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DEEMED WITHDRAWN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/9/20. 10/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Dismissal and to Transfer Venue by INTERMATIC, INC.. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by INTERMATIC, INC...(BENEDETTO, CONRAD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INTERMATIC, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14575923), filed by INTERMATIC, INC..(BENEDETTO, CONRAD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEBSTER v. INTERMATIC, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #14
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermatic, Inc.
Represented By: CONRAD JAMES BENEDETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL AND MARIE WEBSTER
Represented By: Joseph L McGlynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?