Negrete Reyes v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Manuel Salvador Negrete Reyes
Respondent: Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf, William Barr and United States Attorney
Case Number: 3:2020cv02169
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241 is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Clerk of Court directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/11/21. (jam)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Manuel Salvador Negrete Reyes containing doc 7-"Not deliverable as addressed" (cl)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed) filed by Manuel Salvador Negrete Reyes. It is recommended that the petition be DISMISSED AS MOOT and the case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 1/8/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 12/22/20. (ms)
December 22, 2020 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Robert D. Mariani and referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by William Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, United States Attorney, Chad Wolf by William Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, United States Attorney, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Served on Warden Clair Doll, U.S. Atty Scranton, U.S. Atty General Wash DC (ep)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/22/2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 12/8/20. (ms)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #4 sent to Manuel Salvador Negrete Reyes (ep)
November 23, 2020 Receipt of payment from MANUEL SALVADOR NEGRET REYES in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 11/20/2020. Receipt number 333073884 processed by smurphy. (tp)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333073884. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ao)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lp)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Expedition of the Case Due to COVID-19 Pandemic and OUTBREAK in Prison and Detention is Already Pro-Longed. by Manuel Salvador Negrete Reyes. (lp)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Manuel Salvador Negrete Reyes.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negrete Reyes v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Attorney
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel Salvador Negrete Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?