Jackson v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tara Jackson
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv02189
Filed: November 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Tara Jackson. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Barron, George)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Hank on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Hank, Matthew)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Buckingham, Wendy)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Sue Buckingham on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Buckingham, Wendy)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/23/20. (bs)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
November 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5356056), filed by Tara Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Wendy Sue Buckingham
Represented By: Matthew J Hank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Jackson
Represented By: George R. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?