Miles v. Moyle et al
Plaintiff: Donald Miles
Defendant: Richard Clifford, Robert Rachilla and Margaret B. Moyle
Case Number: 3:2020cv02240
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendation filed by Donald Miles. (lg)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's Complaint 9Doc. 1) is DISMISSED without leave to amend. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this action. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/21/20. (jam)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Donald Miles - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the plaintiffs complaint be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 12/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 2, 2020. (kjn)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution wherein Plaintiff is presently confined. For screening purposes only the Complaint is DEEMED filed. Service is deferred pending completion of legally-mandated screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 2, 2020 (kjn)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Federal & Local Rules) (lp)
December 2, 2020 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING Case reassigned to Honorable Robert D. Mariani and referred to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Donald Miles. (ktt)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Miles.(ktt) Modified on 12/1/2020 (ktt).
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Clifford, Margaret B. Moyle, Robert Rachilla lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Donald Miles. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope, #2 Exhibit(s))(ktt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Moyle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rachilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret B. Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?