Beers v. Harrison
Plaintiff: Donavin Beers
Defendant: Corrections Officer Harrison
Case Number: 3:2021cv00107
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Corrections Officer Harrison YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 3/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Corrections Officer Harrison. Corrections Officer Harrison waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Munion, Christine)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E. Munion on behalf of Corrections Officer Harrison (Munion, Christine)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Corrections Officer Harrison and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (sm)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5439416), filed by Donavin Beers.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beers v. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donavin Beers
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Harrison
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?