Davis v. Loeb
Plaintiff: Thomas Davis
Defendant: Harvey Loeb
Case Number: 3:2021cv00167
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thomas Davis Dated 3/23/2021 (Daly, Kane)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Davis. Harvey Loeb served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021. (Daly, Kane)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Harvey Loeb.(Denicola, Jillian)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Harvey Loeb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Affidavit of Defendant)(Denicola, Jillian)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff Attorney re Service Update and request for Extension . (Daly, Kane)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/1/21. (jam)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Harvey Loeb and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (sm)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harvey Loeb ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5452363), filed by Thomas Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Loeb
Represented By: Jillian M. Denicola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Davis
Represented By: Kane Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?