Desher et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Rylee Smyth and Andrew Desher
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00250
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael Bereston. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/26/21. (bs)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Marion K. Munley on behalf of Andrew Desher, Rylee Smyth Attorney Michael Bereston is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5489971.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)(Munley, Marion)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/16/21. (bs)
February 15, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Andrew Desher. Amendment to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet. (Munley, Marion)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (sm)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5467373), filed by Andrew Desher, Rylee Smyth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(sm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2021: #3 signature page) (bs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desher et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rylee Smyth
Represented By: Marion K. Munley
Represented By: Michael H Bereston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Desher
Represented By: Marion K. Munley
Represented By: Michael H Bereston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?