United Government Security Officers of America International Union et al v. Paragon Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: United Government Security Officers of America International Union and United Government Security Officers of America, Local 129
Defendant: Paragon Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00439
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kristen Barnes (eo)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2021 10:30 AM before Chief Judge John E. Jones III. See attached calendar for dates that must be utilized in the JCMP when a trial month is selected. (eo)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by John R. Bielski on behalf of United Government Security Officers of America, Local 129, United Government Security Officers of America International Union Attorney Kristen Barnes is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5509997., filed by on behalf of United Government Security Officers of America, Local 129, United Government Security Officers of America International Union.(Bielski, John)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Paragon Systems, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO CONFIRM AND ENFORCE ARBITRATION AWARD against Paragon Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5508919), filed by United Government Security Officers of America, Local 129, United Government Security Officers of America International Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s)) (ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Government Security Officers of America International Union et al v. Paragon Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Government Security Officers of America International Union
Represented By: John R. Bielski
Represented By: Kristen Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Government Security Officers of America, Local 129
Represented By: John R. Bielski
Represented By: Kristen Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?