Facebook, Inc. et al v. New Ventures Services, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Whatsapp, LLC., Instagram, LLC. and Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: New Ventures Services, Corp. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2021cv00697
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Instagram, LLC., Facebook, Inc., Whatsapp, LLC.. New Ventures Services, Corp. waiver sent on 4/26/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Cohen, Barry)
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to William Rava. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/20/21. (bs)
April 20, 2021 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jacob Dini. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/20/21. (bs)
April 20, 2021 Filing 11 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Fabricio Vayra. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/20/21. (bs)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/15/21. (bs)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Barry L. Cohen on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC., Whatsapp, LLC. Attorney Fabricio Vayra is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5547246.. (Cohen, Barry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Barry L. Cohen on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC., Whatsapp, LLC. Attorney Jacob P. Dini is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5547237.. (Cohen, Barry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Barry L. Cohen on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC., Whatsapp, LLC. Attorney William C. Rava is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5547221.. (Cohen, Barry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an actionTRADEMARK. (sm)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Whatsapp, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Facebook, Inc. for Whatsapp, LLC.. (Cohen, Barry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Instagram, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Facebook, Inc. for Instagram, LLC.. (Cohen, Barry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Facebook, Inc.. (Cohen, Barry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Does 1-10, New Ventures Services, Corp. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (sm)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, New Ventures Services, Corp. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5546476), filed by Instagram, LLC., Facebook, Inc., Whatsapp, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8, #10 Exhibit(s) 9, #11 Exhibit(s) 10, #12 Exhibit(s) 11, #13 Exhibit(s) 12, #14 Exhibit(s) 13, #15 Exhibit(s) 14, #16 Exhibit(s) 15, #17 Exhibit(s) 16, #18 Exhibit(s) 17)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. et al v. New Ventures Services, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whatsapp, LLC.
Represented By: Barry L. Cohen
Represented By: Jacob P Dini
Represented By: William C Rava
Represented By: Fabricio Vayra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Instagram, LLC.
Represented By: Barry L. Cohen
Represented By: Jacob P Dini
Represented By: William C Rava
Represented By: Fabricio Vayra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Barry L. Cohen
Represented By: Jacob P Dini
Represented By: William C Rava
Represented By: Fabricio Vayra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Ventures Services, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?