OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc. et al v. M C Brothers Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc. and Canopius Managing Agents, LTD.
Defendant: M C Brothers Transportation, Inc. and Estate of Federico Alfaro
Case Number: 3:2021cv01789
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc.. Estate of Federico Alfaro served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Strick, Daniel)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc.. M C Brothers Transportation, Inc. served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Strick, Daniel)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/28/21. (bs)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Estate of Federico Alfaro, M C Brothers Transportation, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Estate of Federico Alfaro, M C Brothers Transportation, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5730404), filed by OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc., Canopius Managing Agents, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Commercial Auto - Motor Carriers Policy PL199516638F, #2 Exhibit B - Automobile Physical Damage Policy CUL62516, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc. et al v. M C Brothers Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S. Strick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canopius Managing Agents, LTD.
Represented By: Daniel S. Strick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M C Brothers Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Federico Alfaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?