Top Cuisine Inc. d/b/a Anthracite Cafe v. Uitca First Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Top Cuisine Inc. d/b/a Anthracite Cafe
Defendant: W N Tuscano Agency Inc. and Utica First Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01802
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Defendants YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 12/29/2021 (ms)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Top Cuisine Inc. d/b/a Anthracite Cafe YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 12/29/2021 (ms)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order approving re #2 Stipulation to stay case. Case STAYED pending decision of US Court of Appeals 3d Circuit in Wilson v Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and related cases. See Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 11/12/21. (ms)
November 12, 2021 Case Stayed (ms)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 STIPULATION RE STAY OF CASE by Utica First Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shay, Bryan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Utica First Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2021-1855. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BPAMDC-5732876)filed by Utica First Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - State Court Docs, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Top Cuisine Inc. d/b/a Anthracite Cafe v. Uitca First Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Top Cuisine Inc. d/b/a Anthracite Cafe
Represented By: Scott B. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W N Tuscano Agency Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica First Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan M. Shay
Represented By: Steven J. Schildt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?