Donn Michael's Salon, Inc. v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Donn Michael's Salon, Inc.
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01870
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #3 MOTION to Stay filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Cummins, Nicholas)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Donn Michael's Salon, Inc. Notice of Supplemental Authority (Cooper, Scott)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting an extension to respond to the complaint pending resolution of motion to stay. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/10/21. (bs)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Stay filed by Donn Michael's Salon, Inc..(Cooper, Scott)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay by Donn Michael's Salon, Inc..(Cooper, Scott)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Letter from Nicholas A. Cummins dated 11.8.21 enc Stipulation. (Cummins, Nicholas)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Luzerne County, case number 2021-01852. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5744998), filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(A) Notice, #3 Exhibit(B) Praecipe to Dismiss Party, #4 Exhibit(C) Complaint and CS)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donn Michael's Salon, Inc. v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donn Michael's Salon, Inc.
Represented By: Scott B. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas A. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?