Detect Tank Services LLC et al v. Admiral Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Detect Tank Services LLC and Mott Tank Inspection, Inc.
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv02012
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/30/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 9/1/2022. Defendant Expert Report is due by 9/30/2022. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 10/14/2022. Motions due by 11/1/2022. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 1/24/2022. (cw)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08 during Case Management Conference held on 01/18/2022. (jkc)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Admiral Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkley Insurance Company for Admiral Insurance Company. (Rivers, Ward)
January 10, 2022 VERBAL RESCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 10:00 AM before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. USE CALL-IN NUMBERS FROM PREVIOUS SCHEDULING ORDER. (cw)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Admiral Insurance Company. (Rivers, Ward)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2022 10:00 AM before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 12/21/2021. (cw)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by Admiral Insurance Company.(Rivers, Ward)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Admiral Insurance Company, Detect Tank Services LLC, Mott Tank Inspection, Inc. YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Admiral Insurance Company from Lackawanna County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CV-4034. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5770685)filed by Admiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Praecipe for Writ and Writ of Summons, #2 Exhibit(s) B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice to Plaintiff of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Detect Tank Services LLC et al v. Admiral Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detect Tank Services LLC
Represented By: Scott A. Herlands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mott Tank Inspection, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A. Herlands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: Gerald J. Valentini
Represented By: Ward A. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?