Burton et al v. Selective Way Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Karen Burton and Reese Burton
Defendant: Selective Way Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv02114
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Foley, Melissa)
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Karen Burton, Reese Burton by Karen Burton, Reese Burton.(Wetter, James)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2022 10:00 AM before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. SEE ORDER FOR CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 2/2/2022. (cw)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Karen Burton, Reese Burton, Selective Way Insurance Company YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 3/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw)
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Foley, Melissa)
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Selective Way Insurance Company. Selective Way Insurance Company waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Foley, Melissa)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Foley, Melissa)
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa J. Foley on behalf of Selective Way Insurance Company. (Foley, Melissa)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Selective Way Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (sm)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Selective Way Insurance Company ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5790646), filed by Karen Burton, Reese Burton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton et al v. Selective Way Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Burton
Represented By: James Michael Wetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reese Burton
Represented By: James Michael Wetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Way Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa J. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?