Dohman et al v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nicole S Dohman and Joseph J Dohman, Jr.
Defendant: Progressive Advanced Insurance Company and Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv02151
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 7/22/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 6/22/2022. Defendant Expert Report is due by 7/22/2022. Supplemental due by 8/5/2022. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 8/22/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/22/2022. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/25/22. (bs)
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Conference Call Notification. (Sciandra, Louis)
February 11, 2022 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Twilla, Daniel)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2022 10:00 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.This conference will be held by telephone but may be held in-person if counsel requests and has the concurrence of all other counsel.The courts telephone number is (570) 207-5760. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/22/22. (bs)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CANCELLING 1/31/22 case management conference Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/20/22. (ms)
January 20, 2022 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Malachy E Mannion for all further proceedings. (jkc)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr. Attached scheduling order to be completed and provided to Court 3 business days prior to conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 12/30/21. (ms)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Progressive Direct Insurance Company YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 1/31/2022 (ms)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Plaintiffs YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 1/31/2022 (ms)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Inadomi, Daniel)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company.(Inadomi, Daniel)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. LeVan on behalf of Progressive Advanced Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LeVan, Jennifer)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Inadomi, Daniel)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2021-11492. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5795717), filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 County Court Record, #2 Exh 1, #3 Exh 2, #4 Exh 3, #5 Exh 4, #6 Exh 5, #7 Exh 6, #8 Exh 7, #9 Exh 8, #10 Exh 9, #11 Pracipe to Append Proof of Completion of Service, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dohman et al v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole S Dohman
Represented By: Louis S Sciandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J Dohman, Jr.
Represented By: Louis S Sciandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel W. Inadomi
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel W. Inadomi
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Jennifer L. LeVan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?