Rettig et al v. Progressive Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jolene K. Rettig and Matthew Rettig
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv02174
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint by Jolene K. Rettig, Matthew Rettig. (Mulcahey, John)
March 15, 2022 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Progressive Insurance Company. (LeVan, Jennifer)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference RESCHEDULED for 3/23/2022 11:20 AM before Honorable Robert D. Mariani. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/9/22. (dw)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2022 11:20 AM VIA TELEPHONE before Honorable Robert D. Mariani. See Order for details. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/14/22. (dw)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Progressive Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LeVan, Jennifer)
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to by Progressive Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LeVan, Jennifer)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Insurance Company.(LeVan, Jennifer)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/3/22. (jam)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Progressive Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Advanced Insurance Company for Progressive Insurance Company. (LeVan, Jennifer)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. LeVan on behalf of Progressive Insurance Company. (LeVan, Jennifer)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Insurance Company from Luzerne County, case number 2021-09825. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5798696). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit B- Writ of Summons)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rettig et al v. Progressive Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene K. Rettig
Represented By: Ciara L. DeNaples
Represented By: John M. Mulcahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Rettig
Represented By: John M. Mulcahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer L. LeVan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?