Krupilis v. Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stephanie Krupilis
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00099
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/1/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 8/30/2022. Defendant Expert Report is due by 9/30/2022. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 10/30/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2022 11:00 AM in Scranton before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. Jury Selection set for 12/12/2022 09:30 AM in Scranton before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2022 09:30 AM in Scranton before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. Motions due by 10/30/2022. Supplemental due by 10/15/2022. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 3/18/2022. (cw)
March 15, 2022 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Stephanie Krupilis. (Patel, Sudhir)
March 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Michael)
March 7, 2022 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Answers to Affirmative Defenses by Stephanie Krupilis. #7 Answer to Complaint . (Patel, Sudhir)
March 7, 2022 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Patel, Sudhir)
March 1, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2022 11:00 AM before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. SEE ORDER FOR CALL-IN NUMBERS. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 3/1/2022. (cw)
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (LeVan, Jennifer)
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Specialty Insurance Company for Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (LeVan, Jennifer)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LeVan, Jennifer)
February 24, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Stephanie Krupilis, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 3/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LeVan, Jennifer)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. LeVan on behalf of Progressive Specialty Insurance Company (LeVan, Jennifer)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Stephanie Krupilis. (Patel, Sudhir)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Progressive Specialty Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Pltf Pack) (ep)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Progressive Specialty Insurance Company ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5817608), filed by Stephanie Krupilis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krupilis v. Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Krupilis
Represented By: Sudhir R. Patel
Represented By: Michael B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer L. LeVan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?