Gifford v. The City of Scranton et al
Plaintiff: Bryanna Gifford
Defendant: The City of Scranton and The Scranton Police Department
Case Number: 3:2022cv00137
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 13 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Bryanna Gifford.(Ossont, Michael)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss now must be filed no later than March 25, 2022. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 3/22/2022 (cw)
March 21, 2022 Filing 11 Proposed Pretrial Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Bryanna Gifford. (Ossont, Michael)
March 21, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Ossont is asked to file a proposed order to the motion for extension of time (Doc. 10). (cw)
March 18, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion by Bryanna Gifford.(Ossont, Michael)
March 11, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by The City of Scranton, The Scranton Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Boyd, Matthew)
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by The City of Scranton, The Scranton Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Boyd, Matthew)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Bryanna Gifford, The City of Scranton, The Scranton Police Department YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 3/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Direct Consent Form) (cw)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Boyd on behalf of All Defendants. (Boyd, Matthew)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryanna Gifford. The Scranton Police Department served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. (Ossont, Michael)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryanna Gifford. The City of Scranton served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. (Ossont, Michael)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5286587), filed by Bryanna Gifford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gifford v. The City of Scranton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryanna Gifford
Represented By: Jason J. Mattioli
Represented By: Michael J. Ossont
Represented By: Michael R Goffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Scranton
Represented By: Matthew G. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Scranton Police Department
Represented By: Matthew G. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?