West Coaast Life Insurance Company v. Salak et al
Interpleader: Rose Marie Salak, Christine Salak and West Coaast Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00272
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Rose Marie Salak by Christine Salak. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tamulonis, Frank)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Interpleader Complaint and Summons served on Rose Marie Salak on 04/09/2022, filed by West Coaast Life Insurance Company. (Strauss, Caitlin)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by West Coaast Life Insurance Company. Christine Salak waiver sent on 2/25/2022, answer due 4/26/2022. (Strauss, Caitlin)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank L. Tamulonis, Jr on behalf of Christine Salak. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tamulonis, Frank)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by West Coaast Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Dai-ichi Life Holdings, Inc. for West Coaast Life Insurance Company. (Strauss, Caitlin)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christine Salak, Rose Marie Salak and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dw)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against Christine Salak,individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Kurt S. Salak, and Rose Marie Salak ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5857093)filed by West Coast Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Coaast Life Insurance Company v. Salak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Rose Marie Salak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Christine Salak
Represented By: Frank L. Tamulonis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: West Coaast Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Caitlin Piccarello Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?