Allstate Insurance Company v. Kohut et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Lisa Kohut, Robert Kohut, Lehigh Valley Memorial Hospital-Muhlenberg, Lehigh Valley Health Network and V.K.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00396
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lisa Kohut, Robert Kohut.(Caputo, Christopher)
May 4, 2022 Filing 15 V.K. ANSWER to #1 Complaint by V.K..(Borowsky, Alan)
April 28, 2022 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Robert D. Mariani for all further proceedings. (jkc)
April 21, 2022 Filing 14 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Lisa Kohut, Robert Kohut YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 5/23/2022 (ms)
April 20, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P Caputo on behalf of Lisa Kohut, Robert Kohut (Caputo, Christopher)
April 20, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Robert Kohut, Lisa Kohut. Lisa Kohut waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Caputo, Christopher)
April 7, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Allstate Insurance Company. Lehigh Valley Health Network waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022; Lehigh Valley Memorial Hospital-Muhlenberg waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Lorenz, Michael)
April 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Acquaviva on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Acquaviva, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by V.K. - waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Lorenz, Michael) Modified on 3/30/2022 (gs).
March 29, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Lehigh Valley Health Network, Lehigh Valley Memorial Hospital-Muhlenberg, V.K. YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/28/2022 (ms)
March 29, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Allstate Insurance Company YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/28/2022 (ms)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Borowsky on behalf of V.K.. (Borowsky, Alan)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Guanowsky on behalf of Lehigh Valley Health Network, Lehigh Valley Memorial Hospital-Muhlenberg (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Guanowsky, Glenn)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph N. Bongiovanni on behalf of Lehigh Valley Health Network, Lehigh Valley Memorial Hospital-Muhlenberg (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bongiovanni, Joseph)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Allstate Insurance Company. (Lorenz, Michael)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5882027), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Kohut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael K. Lorenz
Represented By: Joseph Acquaviva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Kohut
Represented By: Christopher P Caputo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kohut
Represented By: Christopher P Caputo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Valley Memorial Hospital-Muhlenberg
Represented By: Glenn Guanowsky
Represented By: Joseph N. Bongiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Valley Health Network
Represented By: Glenn Guanowsky
Represented By: Joseph N. Bongiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V.K.
Represented By: Alan Borowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?