Novitsky v. City of Hazleton Police Department; et al
Plaintiff: Carol M. Novitsky
Defendant: City of Hazleton Police Department;, City of Hazleton Code Enforcement and Nadine Sist
Case Number: 3:2022cv00492
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Receipt of payment from CAROL M. NOVITSKY in the amount of $402.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE- NON-PRISONER. Transaction posted on 4/1/2022. Receipt number 333080545 processed by aoswald. (jjs)
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. (dw)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Hazleton Code Enforcement, City of Hazleton Police Department;, Nadine Sist and provided TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet MJ) (dw)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (dw)
April 1, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 333080545 (dw)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Hazleton Police Dept., et al. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 333080545) filed by Carol M. Novitsky.(dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novitsky v. City of Hazleton Police Department; et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol M. Novitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hazleton Police Department;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hazleton Code Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine Sist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?