Phillips v. United States of America
Plaintiff: David Phillips
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00498
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer United States of America answer due 7/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 5/27/22 (ms)
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to United States of America YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 6/27/2022 (ms)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to David Phillips YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 6/27/2022 (ms)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Euliss, Richard)
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on United States Attorney General and Department of Veterans Affairs on April 12, 2022, filed by David Phillips. (Blazick, Michael)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Phillips. United States of America served on 4/6/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Blazick, Michael)
April 1, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5902498), filed by David Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exh 1- Form 95, #3 Exh 2- VA Receipt of Form 95, #4 Exh 3- Certificate of Merit)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Phillips
Represented By: Michael T. Blazick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Richard D Euliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?