Szymanski v. Travelers Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Joann Szymanski
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company and Vanessa Rivera
Case Number: 3:2022cv00545
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO SETTLE DISCONTINUE by Joann Szymanski. . (Munley, Thomas)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Vanessa Rivera, Joann Szymanski, Travelers Insurance Company YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 5/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Direct Consent Form) (cw)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by Vanessa Rivera, Travelers Insurance Company.(Foland, Brooks)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) by Vanessa Rivera, Travelers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Foland, Brooks)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) of Vanessa Rivera and Certain Counts of the Complaint by Vanessa Rivera, Travelers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foland, Brooks)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Travelers Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Insurance Company. (Foland, Brooks)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Insurance Company, Vanessa Rivera from Lackawanna County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CV-1003. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5914723), filed by Travelers Insurance Company, Vanessa Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A - Original Lackawanna County Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Process, #4 Exhibit C - Entries, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szymanski v. Travelers Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Szymanski
Represented By: Thomas W. Munley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: Allison L Krupp
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Rivera
Represented By: Allison L Krupp
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?