Arcuri et al v. Cordogan Insurance Agency et al
Plaintiff: Dino Arcuri and Geraldine Arcuri
Defendant: Cordogan Insurance Agency and Michael Cordogan
Case Number: 3:2022cv00678
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Referring Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN JOINT by Dino Arcuri, Geraldine Arcuri. (Comitz, Jonathan)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Reed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reed, Matthew)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to David Group. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/21/22. (bs)
June 20, 2022 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Eileen M. Ficaro on behalf of Michael Cordogan, Cordogan Insurance Agency Attorney David Group is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number BPAMDC-5978901., filed by on behalf of Michael Cordogan, Cordogan Insurance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ficaro, Eileen) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/21/2022) (bs).
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2022 01:30 PM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.. This conference will be held by telephone but may be held in-person if counsel requests and has the concurrence of all other counsel. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/8/22. (bs)
June 7, 2022 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Malachy E Mannion for all further proceedings. (jkc)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2022 11:30 AM before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. SEE ORDER FOR CALL-IN NUMBERS. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 5/19/2022. (cw)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michael Cordogan, Cordogan Insurance Agency. (Ficaro, Eileen)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Cordogan, Cordogan Insurance Agency.(Ficaro, Eileen)
May 12, 2022 Filing 2 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Dino Arcuri, Geraldine Arcuri, Michael Cordogan, Cordogan Insurance Agency YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 6/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Direct Consent Form) (cw)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Cordogan, Cordogan Insurance Agency from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2022-03596. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5939548), filed by Michael Cordogan, Cordogan Insurance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Praecipe)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arcuri et al v. Cordogan Insurance Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino Arcuri
Represented By: Jonathan S. Comitz
Represented By: Matthew Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Arcuri
Represented By: Jonathan S. Comitz
Represented By: Matthew Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordogan Insurance Agency
Represented By: Eileen M. Ficaro
Represented By: David Allen Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cordogan
Represented By: Eileen M. Ficaro
Represented By: David Allen Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?