Teehan v. CSAA General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James Teehan
Defendant: CSAA General Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00879
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2022. Discovery due by 12/30/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 1/31/2023. Defendant Expert Report is due by 3/3/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2022. Motions due by 4/17/2023. Supplemental due by 3/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/11/22. (ms)
July 11, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
July 6, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order to Mag Judge Saporito by James Teehan.(Walsh, Brian) Modified on 7/7/2022 (ms).
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2022 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/29/22. (ms)
June 29, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to CSAA General Insurance Company YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/29/2022 (ms)
June 29, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to James Teehan YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/29/2022 (ms)
June 29, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSAA General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Riemenschneider, Andrew)
June 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Riemenschneider on behalf of CSAA General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Riemenschneider, Andrew)
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE (Non Summons & Complaint) by James Teehan (Walsh, Brian)
June 24, 2022 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Andrew L. Riemenschneider Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/24/22. (ms)
June 22, 2022 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrew L. Riemenschneider on behalf of CSAA General Insurance Company Attorney Andrew Riemenschneider is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5981718.. (Riemenschneider, Andrew)
June 6, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walsh, Brian)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSAA General Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Pltf Packet) (ep)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSAA General Insurance Company ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5963781), filed by James Teehan.(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teehan v. CSAA General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Teehan
Represented By: Brian J. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA General Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew L. Riemenschneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?