American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. Davidson et al
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Defendant: Andrew Davidson, Michele Davidson-Almond and Richard Almond
Case Number: 3:2022cv00905
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Richard Almond, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Andrew Davidson, Michele Davidson-Almond YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/2/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Direct Consent For,) (cw)
August 2, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint in Declaratory Judgment Action by Richard Almond, Andrew Davidson, Michele Davidson-Almond.(ep)
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Richard Almond served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Gallogly, Andrew)
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Michele Davidson-Almond served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Gallogly, Andrew)
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Andrew Davidson served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Gallogly, Andrew)
July 28, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel for Pltf is advised: In order that ECF may create and satisfy automatically-generated Service and Answer deadlines, in the above-captioned case Docs. #6 , #7 , #8 (Affidavits of Service) should be re-filed using the proper event, "Summons Returned Executed" found in the category, "Service of Process" under the heading, "Initial Pleadings and Service".For toll-free ECF telephone support, you may call the divisionaloffice nearest to you during regular business hours:Scranton: 866-263-8479Harrisburg: 866-333-3261Williamsport: 866-736-3914 Ed PetroskiDeputy Clerk(ep)
July 27, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Michele Davidson-Almond on 07/22/2022, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Gallogly, Andrew)
July 27, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Richard Almond on 07/22/2022, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Gallogly, Andrew)
July 27, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Andrew Davidson on 07/22/2022, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Gallogly, Andrew)
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued (Amended Complaint filed) as to Richard Almond, Andrew Davidson, Michele Davidson-Almond and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Plaintiff Packet) (ep)
July 20, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Gallogly, Andrew)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corp., Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corp for American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Gallogly, Andrew)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Richard Almond, Andrew Davidson, Michele Davidson-Almond and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Pltf Packet) (ep)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Almond, Andrew Davidson, Michele Davidson-Almond ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5968418), filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A, #2 Exh. B, #3 Exh. C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. Davidson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Andrew J. Gallogly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Joseph S. Toczydlowski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Davidson-Almond
Represented By: Joseph S. Toczydlowski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Almond
Represented By: Joseph S. Toczydlowski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?