Howell v. Wetzel et al
Plaintiff: Reverand Wesley Howell
Defendant: John Wetzel, Kevin Ransom, Paul Bach, Sedeski, Jon and Jane Does 1-5, Well Path, LLC, MHM Services, Inc., ABC Corporation, Nicole Ashton, Temeka Austin, Charles Reed, Jane/John Does 1-10 and Dr. Scott Prince
Case Number: 3:2022cv01255
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey A. Bedell on behalf of John Wetzel (Bedell, Lindsey)
September 30, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John Wetzel. John Wetzel waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Bedell, Lindsey)
September 27, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey A. Bedell on behalf of Nicole Ashton, Temeka Austin, Kevin Ransom, Charles Reed, Sedeski (Bedell, Lindsey)
September 27, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Nicole Ashton, Kevin Ransom, Temeka Austin, Charles Reed, Sedeski. Nicole Ashton waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022; Kevin Ransom waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022; Temeka Austin waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022; Charles Reed waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022; Sedeski waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Bedell, Lindsey)
September 19, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by MHM Services, Inc., Paul Bach. MHM Services, Inc. waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022; Paul Bach waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Neal, Cassidy)
September 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassidy L Neal on behalf of Paul Bach, MHM Services, Inc. (Neal, Cassidy)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected of a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/12/22. (jam)
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ABC Corporation, Nicole Ashton, Temeka Austin, Paul Bach, Jane/John Does 1-10, Jon and Jane Does 1-5, MHM Services, Inc., Scott Prince, Kevin Ransom, Charles Reed, Sedeski, Well Path, LLC, John Wetzel and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
August 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Corporation, Nicole Ashton, Temeka Austin, Paul Bach, Jane/John Does 1-10, Jon and Jane Does 1-5, MHM Services, Inc., Scott Prince, Kevin Ransom, Charles Reed, Sedeski, Well Path, LLC, John Wetzel ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-6026456), filed by Wesley Howell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Wetzel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverand Wesley Howell
Represented By: Alan E. Denenberg
Represented By: Leticia C. Chavez-Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wetzel
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ransom
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Bach
Represented By: Cassidy L Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedeski
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon and Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Well Path, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Services, Inc.
Represented By: Cassidy L Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Ashton
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temeka Austin
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Reed
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Scott Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?