Sholcosky v. Cooper Lighting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Sholcosky
Defendant: Cooper Lighting, LLC and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01771
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order approving #21 Stipulation of Dismissal of Home Depot. See Order for full details. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 1/3/23. (jam)
December 9, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal Of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Stringham, John)
November 7, 2022 Filing 20 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-03717 containing electronic documents. jw
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. &1406 (a); ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 11/7/22. 11/7/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER TO MIDDLE DISTRICT by COOPER LIGHTING, LLC. (MAVROS, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Pretrial Telephone Conference held on 11/2/22. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 16 Discovery Plan by HOME DEPOT USA, INC..(STRINGHAM, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/2/22 AT 3:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/19/22. 10/19/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
October 19, 2022 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Home Depot, Inc. by HOME DEPOT USA, INC., HOME DEPOT USA, INC..(STRINGHAM, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
October 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN GRANT STRINGHAM on behalf of HOME DEPOT USA, INC., HOME DEPOT USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(STRINGHAM, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/22 IS CANCELLED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/18/22. 10/18/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
October 14, 2022 Filing 11 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by COOPER LIGHTING, LLC.(MAVROS, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
October 14, 2022 Filing 10 Report Of Rule 26(f) by RONALD SHOLCOSKY. (GALLAGHER, MATTHEW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPER LIGHTING, LLC.(CZARNIK, KATELYN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 10/12/22 IS RESCHEDULED TO 10/19/22 AT 11:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 9/23/22. 9/23/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN TAYLOR CZARNIK on behalf of COOPER LIGHTING, LLC (CZARNIK, KATELYN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
September 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW E. GALLAGHER on behalf of RONALD SHOLCOSKY (GALLAGHER, MATTHEW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 10/12/22 AT 11:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 9/22/22. 9/22/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by COOPER LIGHTING, LLC.(MAVROS, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 EXHIBIT CIVIL COVER SHEET AND DESIGNATION FORM by COOPER LIGHTING, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(MAVROS, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COOPER LIGHTING, LLC to Federal Court from Court of Common Pleas Philadelphia County, case number 220801279., filed by COOPER LIGHTING, LLC.(MAVROS, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/7/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sholcosky v. Cooper Lighting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sholcosky
Represented By: Brandon A. Swartz
Represented By: Matthew E. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Lighting, LLC
Represented By: Katelyn T. Czarnik
Represented By: Christopher G. Mavros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: John Grant Stringham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?