Santana v. Ransom et al
Petitioner: Eric O. Santana
Respondent: Kevin J. Ransom, The District Attorney of the County of Luzerne, . and The Attorney General of the State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 3:2023cv01428
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DB
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/04/2023. (gg)
September 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support to #9 MOTION to Stay filed by Eric O. Santana.(ao)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The Clerk of Court is directed to send the petnr's "Motion for leave to stay & Abeyance" #9 to the Clerk of Court for the Middle District of PA. Signed by Honorable Paul S. Diamond, Judge on 9/19/2023. (jw)
September 19, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay & Abeyance pending disposition of petnr's collateral efforts in state courts by Eric O. Santana.(jw)
August 25, 2023 Filing 8 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 25, 2023 Filing 7 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
August 25, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Stay & Abeyance in Accordance with: Sub. Sec. 13.3.(A) - Pre-Exhaustion submitted by Eric O. Santana.(lp)
August 25, 2023 Filing 5 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-03058 containing electronic documents.
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/25/23. 8/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2023.]
August 23, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION FOR STAY AND ABEYANCE, FILED BY ERIC O. SANTANA.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (MAILED TO PRO SE)(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ERIC O. SANTANA.(FEE NOT PAID, NO IFP FILED)(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santana v. Ransom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric O. Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin J. Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The District Attorney of the County of Luzerne, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?