Lee v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Rashim Lee
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Case Number: 3:2024cv00893
Filed: May 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2024 Filing 12 Transcript from the Social Security Administration of entire record of proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non Disability Related Development, #6 Disability Related Development, #7 Medical Records)(Dreher, Patricia)
July 16, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Martin O'Malley. Plaintiff Brief due by 8/15/2024.(Dreher, Patricia)
June 7, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2022-19. (jkc)
June 7, 2024 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jennifer L. Dunn Signed by Chief MJ Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/7/24. (ms)
June 4, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Rashim Lee, Martin O'Malley YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/5/2024 (Attachments: #1 Consent defendant) (ms)
June 3, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Dreher on behalf of Martin O'Malley. (Dreher, Patricia)
May 31, 2024 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER 2022-26 in Social Security Appeals (dj)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the Commissioner of the commencement of this action. Signed by Chief MJ Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 5/31/24 (ms)
May 31, 2024 Service Made Electronically - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g), and the Court's Standing Order 2022-26, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Court's CM/ECF system notifying the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Middle District of Pennsylvania of the commencement of this action. No summons shall issue. (dj)
May 30, 2024 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jennifer Latstetter Dunn on behalf of Rashim Lee Attorney Jennifer Dunn is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6654818.. (Dunn, Jennifer)
May 30, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Rashim Lee. (Merritt, Hannalore)
May 30, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rashim Lee.(ao)
May 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Rashim Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashim Lee
Represented By: Jennifer Latstetter Dunn
Represented By: Hannalore B. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Patricia Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?