LUCAS v. FRANCISCO et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Curtis Lucas, Jr.
Defendant: Eric Pipenbrink and Mejia Francisco
Case Number: 3:2024cv01172
Filed: July 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint on or before 9/10/2024. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, this case will proceed based on his original Complaint. (Doc. 5). Plaintiff is advised that the failure to file an amended complaint may result in the dismissal of claims in this action or the action in its entirety. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 8/8/2024. (caw)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 is GRANTED. (2) Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 5) is DEEMED filed. (3) Plaintiff is reminded that he has an affirmative obligation to keep the Court informed of his current address. If Plaintiff's address changes while this lawsuit is pending, Plaintiff must immediately inform the Court in writing. If the Court is unable to communicate with Plaintiff because he has failed to notify the Court of his address, Plaintiff may be deemed to have abandoned the lawsuit. (4) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), the Court will conduct a preliminary review of the Plaintiff's Complaint. Service will be held in abeyance until the screening process is complete. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 8/8/2024. (caw)
July 16, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Curtis Lucas, Jr. (caw)
July 16, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Eddie Curtis Lucas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope) (Originally filed in WDPA as an attachment to Doc #1 on July 1, 2024.) (jw)
July 16, 2024 Filing 4 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:24-cv-00935 containing electronic documents.
July 8, 2024 Filing 3 Remark: On this date, a copy of #2 Memorandum Order was mailed to Mr. Lucas. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 7/16/2024.]
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). For the reasons as set forth herein, this matter is TRANSFERRED FORTHWITH to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania for all further proceedings, including consideration of the Plaintiff's request for IFP status. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/8/24. (bdb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 7/16/2024.]
July 1, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EDDIE CURTIS LUCAS. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Envelope) (njd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 7/16/2024.] Modified on 7/16/2024 (caw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUCAS v. FRANCISCO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Curtis Lucas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Pipenbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mejia Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?