D.A. et al v. Scranton School District
Plaintiff: C.G., D.A. and D.A., Jr.
Defendant: Scranton School District
Case Number: 3:2024cv01765
Filed: October 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Julia K Munley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - as pltfs' counsel has advised that case has settled, Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case; Parties to have 60 days to consummate the settlement. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/13/24. (sm)
October 21, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by D.A.. Scranton School District waiver sent on 10/17/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (Minora, John)
October 18, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenna M. Hazeltine on behalf of Scranton School District (Hazeltine, Glenna)
October 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Freund, III on behalf of Scranton School District (Freund, John)
October 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 10/17/24. (sm)
October 17, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by C.G., D.A., D.A., Jr. (Minora, John)
October 17, 2024 Receipt of payment from DPAM324CV001765 in the amount of $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner. Transaction posted on 10/16/2024. Receipt number 333112061 processed by EP. (jjs)
October 16, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Scranton School District and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
October 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scranton School District ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number 333112061), filed by D.A., C.G., D.A., Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Due Process Hearing Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Settlement Agreement and Release, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email re Settlement Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.A. et al v. Scranton School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.G.
Represented By: John J. Minora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.A.
Represented By: John J. Minora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.A., Jr.
Represented By: John J. Minora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scranton School District
Represented By: John E. Freund, III
Represented By: Glenna M. Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?