F. et al v. North Pocono School District
Plaintiff: Katie S. and Koda F.
Defendant: North Pocono School District
Case Number: 3:2024cv02225
Filed: December 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2025 Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD FROM THE OFFICE OF DISPUTE RESOLUTION (The document is restricted to attorneys/parties of record in this case). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Protective Order Notice, #2 Exhibit(s) Certification Request (24-02226), #3 Exhibit(s) Certification Request (24-02225), #4 Exhibit(s) HO Decision, #5 Exhibit(s) LEA Closing, #6 Exhibit(s) Parent Closing, #7 Exhibit(s) Transcript 4, #8 Exhibit(s) Transcript 3, #9 Exhibit(s) Transcript 2, #10 Exhibit(s) Transcript 1, #11 Exhibit(s) Parent Exhibits, #12 Exhibit(s) Email to Intent to Withdraw Motion, #13 Exhibit(s) Motion to Dismiss, #14 Exhibit(s) Motion to Limit, #15 Exhibit(s) DP Complaint)(Office of Dispute Resolution, )
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases ; 3:24-cv-2226 CLOSED and CONSOLIDATED INTO 3:24-cv-2225; Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 2/3/25 (ep)
January 31, 2025 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel for North Pocono School District is instructed to file to civil no 3:24-CV-2226 a duplicate of its Doc. 6 motion to consolidate filed in civil no 3:24-CV-2225 (ms)
January 29, 2025 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by North Pocono School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence)(McPartland, William)
January 20, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. McPartland on behalf of North Pocono School District (McPartland, William)
January 17, 2025 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by North Pocono School District. North Pocono School District waiver sent on 1/8/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. (McPartland, William)
December 29, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Saporito. (jw)
December 23, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Koda F., Katie S.. (no corporate parents) (ep)
December 23, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to North Pocono School District and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North Pocono School District ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6852750), filed by Katie S., Koda F.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F. et al v. North Pocono School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie S.
Represented By: Heather Hulse
Represented By: Dennis Daniel Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koda F.
Represented By: Heather Hulse
Represented By: Dennis Daniel Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Pocono School District
Represented By: William J. McPartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?