North Pocono School District v. K.S., ON BEHALF OF K.F.
Plaintiff: North Pocono School District
Defendant: K.S., ON BEHALF OF K.F.
Case Number: 3:2024cv02226
Filed: December 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Consolidate Cases; 3:24-cv-2226 CLOSED and CONSOLIDATED INTO 3:24-cv-2225; Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 2/3/25 (ep)
January 31, 2025 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by North Pocono School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence)(McPartland, William)
January 30, 2025 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by K.S., ON BEHALF OF K.F.. K.S., ON BEHALF OF K.F. waiver sent on 12/30/2024, answer due 2/28/2025. (McPartland, William)
January 29, 2025 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original Doc. 4 DELETED as it was filed in error; (ep)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 1/7/2025. (cw)
December 23, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to K.S., ON BEHALF OF K.F. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dw)
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (APPEALING HEARING OFFICER DECISION IN ODR NUMBER 29032-23-24) against K.S., ON BEHALF OF K.F. ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6852822), filed by North Pocono School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Pocono School District v. K.S., ON BEHALF OF K.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.S., ON BEHALF OF K.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Pocono School District
Represented By: William J. McPartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?