Barat et al v. B and S Lighting and Furniture Outlet Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sameer Mohammad Barat and B&S Lighting & Furniture Inc.
Defendant: B and S Lighting and Furniture Outlet Inc., Sohrab Barat and Illuminaire Lighting and Furniture LLC
Case Number: 3:2025cv00181
Filed: January 29, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Julia K Munley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2025 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sohrab Barat, Illuminaire Lighting and Furniture LLC, B and S Lighting and Furniture Outlet Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mazzeo, Frank)
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - answer due 3/28/25 Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 2/27/255 (sm)
February 26, 2025 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sohrab Barat, Illuminaire Lighting and Furniture LLC, B and S Lighting and Furniture Outlet Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mazzeo, Frank)
February 18, 2025 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Sameer Mohammad Barat, B&S Lighting & Furniture Inc.. (Sexton, Christopher)
February 11, 2025 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Exhibit(s) Summons in a Civil Action served on Illuminaire Lighting and Furniture LLC on 02/05/2025, filed by Sameer Mohammad Barat, B&S Lighting & Furniture Inc.. (Chwastyk, Anthony)
February 11, 2025 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Exhibit(s) Summons in a Civil Action served on Sohrab Barat on 02/05/2025, filed by Sameer Mohammad Barat, B&S Lighting & Furniture Inc.. (Chwastyk, Anthony)
February 11, 2025 Filing 7 VERBAL ORDER WITHDRAWING #5 Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction., per Notice filed by counsel #6 Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 2/11/25. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (sm)
February 9, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE by Sameer Mohammad Barat, B&S Lighting & Furniture Inc. re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Withdraw Motion without prejudice (Chwastyk, Anthony)
February 7, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sameer Mohammad Barat, B&S Lighting & Furniture Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chwastyk, Anthony)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 1/31/25. (sm)
January 30, 2025 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Chwastyk is directed to have Attorney Sexton and Attorney Rizvi file for special admission (or make arrangements to be generally admitted) and to request e-filing privileges through Pacer.uscourts.gov (all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption). (ea)
January 29, 2025 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an actionTRADEMARK. (ao)
January 29, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to B and S Lighting and Furniture Outlet Inc., Sohrab Barat, Illuminaire Lighting and Furniture LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
January 29, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B and S Lighting and Furniture Outlet Inc., Sohrab Barat, Illuminaire Lighting and Furniture LLC ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-688428), filed by Sameer Mohammad Barat, B&S Lighting & Furniture Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barat et al v. B and S Lighting and Furniture Outlet Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sameer Mohammad Barat
Represented By: Saeed A. Rizvi
Represented By: Christopher W. Sexton
Represented By: Anthony H. Chwastyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&S Lighting & Furniture Inc.
Represented By: Saeed A. Rizvi
Represented By: Christopher W. Sexton
Represented By: Anthony H. Chwastyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B and S Lighting and Furniture Outlet Inc.
Represented By: Frank A. Mazzeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sohrab Barat
Represented By: Frank A. Mazzeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illuminaire Lighting and Furniture LLC
Represented By: Frank A. Mazzeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?