Delp v. Hexcel Corporation
Plaintiff: Russell Delp
Defendant: Hexcel Corporation
Case Number: 3:2025cv00233
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2611 Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Hexcel Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Hexcel Corporation answer due by 4/11/2025. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 3/18/2025 (cac)
March 13, 2025 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Catherine F. Burgett Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 3/13/2025. (cac)
March 13, 2025 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Katherine Koop Irwin Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 3/13/2025. (cac)
March 12, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hexcel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Snider, Jillian)
March 12, 2025 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Catherine F. Burgett on behalf of Hexcel Corporation Attorney Catherine Burgett is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6929475., filed by on behalf of Hexcel Corporation.(Burgett, Catherine)
March 12, 2025 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Katherine E Koop Irwin on behalf of Hexcel Corporation Attorney Katherine Koop Irwin is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6929421., filed by on behalf of Hexcel Corporation.(Koop Irwin, Katherine)
March 12, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian N Snider on behalf of Hexcel Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Snider, Jillian)
February 13, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Russell Delp. Hexcel Corporation served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/5/2025. (Dion, Samuel)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 2/7/2025. (cac)
February 6, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hexcel Corporation and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dj)
February 6, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hexcel Corporation ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6893546), filed by Russell Delp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delp v. Hexcel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Delp
Represented By: Samuel Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hexcel Corporation
Represented By: Katherine E Koop Irwin
Represented By: Jillian N Snider
Represented By: Catherine F. Burgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?