Knepp v. United Stone Veneer, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2006cv01018
Filed: May 19, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
Presiding Judge: James F. McClure
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ***VACATED TO THE EXTENT PROVIDED IN THE COURT'S ORDER ISSUED 5/8/2009, REC. DOC. NO. 163*** MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Granting defendant USV's 129 motion in limine to exclude testimony of plaintiff's expert, Terry P. Leslie; granting de fendant USV's 131 motion in limine to preclude plaintiff from requesting a specific monetary award for pain and suffering and punitive damages, if the Court charges punitive damages; granting defendant USV's 134 motion in limine to excl ude evidence of David J. Barrett's 1993 convictions for simple assault and false imprisonment and any evidence related thereto; granting defendant USV's 136 motion in limine to exclude evidence re Andrea Barrett's compensation as office manager. Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 3/12/09. (km, ) Modified on 5/8/2009 pursuant to the court's order of 5/8/09 163 .
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Denying plaintiff's motion 113 in limine to exclude evidence regarding David Barrett's Lyme Disease affliction; granting plaintiff's motion 113 in limine to exclude evidence of her prior relationships, marriag e, and/or divorce; granting plaintiffs motion 113 in limine to exclude evidence that her husband's alleged drinking and/or substance abuse problem; granting plaintiffs motion 113 in limine to exclude evidence of the alleged condition and/or health of her marriage; granting plaintiff's motion 113 in limine to exclude evidence regarding her husband's employment history and/or his earned history or capacity; granting plaintiff's motion 113 in limine to exclude evidence regarding a recorded telephone conversation involving Larry Yarger, David Barrett, Angela Barrett and Vicki Sealover. Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 12/4/08. (km, )
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: DENYING plaintiff's 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 9/23/08. (km, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knepp v. United Stone Veneer, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?