Powell v. Symons
Plaintiff: Kevin Powell
Defendant: Dr. Symons
Case Number: 4:2007cv02225
Filed: December 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Centre
Presiding Judge: James F. McClure
Presiding Judge: J. Andrew Smyser
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab for Pretrial Management. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is REFERRED TO MJ Schwab for pretrial management. 239 236 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/6/14. (sc)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Magistrate Judge Schwabs Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 228) is NOT ADOPTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 189) is DENIED, and the above-captioned action is referred back to Magistrate Judge Schwab for pretrial management. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/6/13. (sc)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 148 of Magistrate Judge Smyser; granting defendant's 64 motion for summary judgment; entering final judgmet in favor of defendant Symons and against plaintiff; directing the clerk to close the case file. Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 4/12/10. (km, )
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 53 ; denying defendant's 15 Motion to Dismiss; remanding the case to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 10/27/08. (km, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Symons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Symons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?