Phelan v. Adelphia Communications Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Phelan
Defendant: Adelphia Communications Corporation, OFE II, LLC and Adelphia Consolidation, LLC
Case Number: 4:2008cv00730
Filed: April 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Potter
Presiding Judge: James F. McClure
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: GRANTING defendants' 75 motion for reconsideration; DENYING plaintiff's 34 motion for partial summary judgment; DENYING defendants' motion for oral argument; scheduling a further case management conference for 12/8/2009 11:00 AM before Honorable James F. McClure Jr.; defendants' counsel shall arrange for the conference call. Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 12/1/09. (km, )
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Revise the Memorandum of July 8, 2009 is DENIED. (Rec. Doc. No. 61); defendants' Motion to Vacate the Court's July 8, 2009 Order is DENIED without prejudice. (Rec. Doc. No. 65);De fendants may, if they so desire, file a motion for reconsideration in lieu of its Rule 60(b) motion by September 22, 2009. If defendants do not file a motion for reconsideration by this date, they will be precluded from filing any further motions at tempting to vacate our July 8, 2009 Order, and we will order briefing on damages pursuant to our July 8, 2009 Order in anticipation of entering declaratory judgment on Count I in favor of plaintiff. Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 9/2/09. (km, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Decision on plaintiff's 34 motion for partial summary judgment is deferred pending a final order re damages; it is adjudged that the "liquidated damages" provision of plaintiff's contract w/defendant result ing in a forfeiture of $999,750.00 is invalid as a penalty; on or before 7/22/2009, defendants shall remit $999,750.00 to the Clerk of Courts for the Middle District of PA in Williamsport, PA, pending the determination of the appropriate am ount of damages, if any; defendants' 54 motion for oral argument is denied; defendants are directed to file a brief on or before 7/27/2009 re what amount of damages, if any, are appropriate. Plaintiff will have 10 business days from the date of service of defendants' brief to file an opposing brief; a reply brief isnot permitted without leave of court.Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 7/8/09. (km, ) (cc: Scranton Financial [Edmunds/Lavelle]; Rebecca Wither, WMSPT Clerk's Office)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phelan v. Adelphia Communications Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Phelan
Represented By: David R. Bahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelphia Communications Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFE II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelphia Consolidation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?