Dieffenbach v. Department of Revenue et al
Plaintiff: Gary R. Dieffenbach
Defendant: Department of Revenue, Office of Inspector General, Earl Crago, Mike Garman, Joe Craigwell, Paul Sload, Kimberly Glaser, Carrie Ferree, Allen Jones and Colleen Alviani
Case Number: 4:2009cv00967
Filed: May 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Sullivan
Presiding Judge: Malcolm Muir
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED 131 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Gary R. Dieffenbach is DENIED. The Court directs Pltf to tender the appellate filing and docketing fee to the Clerk of Court or Pltf may refile his motion seeking leave to proceed IFP w/ the United States Court of Appeals for the 3rd Circuit. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on August 2, 2011. (sc)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED and the MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. 114 123 Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on June 29, 2011. (sc)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 91 Response filed by Gary R. Dieffenbach. Plaintiff's motion to reconsider is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on 12/22/10. (pw, )
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 81 MOTION for Reconsideration is DENIED and Mag. Judge Smyser shall continue to dispose of any remaining pretrial issues. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Dec. 6, 2010. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dieffenbach v. Department of Revenue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary R. Dieffenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Inspector General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Crago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Garman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Craigwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sload
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Ferree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Alviani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?