UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Crissman et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Ellery A. Crissman, II, Penny L. Crissman, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Commerce Bank/Harrisburg, Ticor Title Insurance Company, Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania and Best Line Leasing, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv01884
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Centre
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 94 Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's Order dated October 14, 2011 is revised. See Order for specific details. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 11/22/11 (jam, )
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 85 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 11/4/11 (jam, )
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:1) The United Statess unopposed Motion for Partial Summary Judgement against Defendant Penny Crissman (Doc. 52) is GRANTED without a merits analysis. 2) The United Statess Motion for Summary Judgement (Doc. 72) is GRANTED in that the United States has valid and subsisting tax liens that attached to the Real Property located at 110 Piccadilly Road, Port Matilda, Centre County, Pennsylvania ( the Property); that those tax liens be and are foreclosed ; that the United States may sell the Real Property in accordance with a separate Order to be entered by the Court. 3) The United States is directed to submit such an appropriate order for sale of the Property to the Court within twenty-one (21) day s. 4) The United Statess Motion for Summary Judgement (Doc. 72) is GRANTED in respect to its assertion of priority against Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. as a general matter of law. 5) The United Statess Motion for Summa ry Judgement (Doc. 72) is DENIED in respect to its assertion that the Stipulation between the parties does not control the issue of lien priority in this specific instance. 6) The Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. (Doc. 69) is DENIED. 7) The Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.s Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief (Doc. 21) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/27/11 (jam, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Crissman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel J. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellery A. Crissman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny L. Crissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce Bank/Harrisburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticor Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Line Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?