Cizek v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Paul H. Cizek
Defendant: John B. Leete, Mary G. Davis, Thomas R. Shaffer and Potter County Government Officials
Case Number: 4:2010cv00185
Filed: January 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Potter
Presiding Judge: Malachy E. Mannion
Presiding Judge: James F. McClure
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the magistrate judge 34 , GRANTING defts Davis & Shaffer's motion to dismiss 12 , GRANTING deft Leete's motion to dismiss 23 , GRANTING deft Potter Co Gov't's motion to dismiss 29 , DENYING Cizek's motion to reconsider 16 as MOOT, & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case file. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/28/10. (ki)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mary G. Davis, Thomas R. Shaffer, 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by John B. Leete, 29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Potter County Government Officials Objections to R&R due by 12/16/2010Signed by Magistrate Judge Malachy E. Mannion on 11/29/10. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(ep, )
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: DENYING Cizek's 9 "Writs of Error Coram Nobis and Coram Vobis Motion to Reconsider Judge James F. McClure, Jr. Order with Affidavit." Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 4/9/2010. (km, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING Cizek's "Notice, Motion, and Affidavit for Recusal of the Assigned Judge James F. McClure, Jr., Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 144 and 455, for the Reasons Listed Below." Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 3/11/2010. (km, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cizek v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Leete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary G. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potter County Government Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul H. Cizek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?