Cope v. Brosius et al
Plaintiff: Edward J. Cope
Defendant: Gretchen Brosius, Timothy A. Fink, Clifford L. Kriner, Leonard Zboray, Gregory Carl, Borough of Northumberland Pennsylvania, Northumberland Police Officers' Association, Joshua E. Vankirk and Point Township, Pennsylvania
Case Number: 4:2012cv02382
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Northumberland
Presiding Judge: Matthew W. Brann
Presiding Judge: Martin C. Carlson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary judgment [#124] is granted; The report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Carlson [#131] is adopted in part and rejected in part; Defendants' motion to strike objections [#134] is denied; Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and close this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/4/18. (lg)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion to compel, (Docs. 112 and 114.) is GRANTED, in part, and IT IS ORDERED that the report submitted to the Court for in camera review be released in an unredacted form to the plaintiff on or before November 15, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 7, 2016. (kjn)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion to compel, (Docs. 112 and 114.) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED in part. The defendants request for a telephonic conference is DENIED since this order resolves this dispute. SEE MEMO & ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 11, 2016. (kjn)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM ORDER - the plaintiffs motion for an order directing the counsel for the deceased defendant to substitute a new party-defendant, (Doc. 54 ),is DENIED and IT IS ORDERED as follows: A motion for substitution must be filedby plaintiff, proposing to substitute a new representative party for the deceased defendant on or before May 1, 2014. If no such motion is filed, this action may be dismissed pursuant to Rule 25. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 21, 2014. (kjn)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, the defts' mtns to dismiss filed in this action 13 15 16 are DISMISSED as moot, but without prejudice to the filing of an appropriate dispositive mtn challenging the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 2/25/13. (jc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cope v. Brosius et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Cope
Represented By: Dennis E. Boyle
Represented By: Devon M. Jacob
Represented By: Travis S. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Brosius
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy A. Fink
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford L. Kriner
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Zboray
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Carl
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Northumberland Pennsylvania
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northumberland Police Officers' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua E. Vankirk
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point Township, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?